This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/09/2022 at 00:59:13 (UTC).

Poe v. Pioneer Medical Group Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 Poe filed an Other lawsuit against Pioneer Medical Group Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sahagun, Raul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6457

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sahagun, Raul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Henry Poe

Respondents and Defendants

Pioneer Medical Group Inc.

Southern California Infectious Disease Medical Group

Patti Morris

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Robert C. Moest

Attorney at Law offices of Robert C. Moest

2530 Wilshire Blvd. 2Nd Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

David J. Weiss

11340 West Olympic Blvd. Suite 100

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Kenneth R. Pedroza

Attorney at Cole Pedroza LLP

2295 Huntington Dr

San Marino, CA 91108

Daniel Vincent Farrugia

11340 W Olympic Blvd Ste 100

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Cassidy C. Davenport

2295 Huntington Drive

San Marino, CA 91108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Dec. 28, 2021: 8.122 no RT (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Fee Waiver granted on Dec 28, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request filed to:; Notes: Confidential Response to the Order issued on Dec 17, 2021 re Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Fee waiver request denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: The court has read and considered appellant's motion for an order vacating dismissal filed December 15, 2021. The motion is granted. It appearing that through inadvertence and mistake on December 14, 2021, the clerk dismissed the appeal filed November 10, 2021 pursuant to Rule 8.100(c), the dismissal order filed December 14, 2021 is hereby vacated. The request to waive court fees and response with additional information regarding fee waiver application submitted December 15, 2021 is considered filed. The order on court fee waiver is filed under separate cover. The clerk of the Superior Court is ordered to proceed with the preparation of the record on appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: Request to waive court fees and Response with additional information regarding fee waiver application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(c), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed November 10, 2021, is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Fee waiver request denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Henry Poe Attorney: Robert C. Moest (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: by appellant Henry Poe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Henry PoeAttorney: Robert C. Moest; Notes: (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Defendants and Respondents SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INFECTIOUS DISEASE MEDICAL GROUP and PATTI MORRIS associate Kenneth Pedroza and Cassidy Davenport of Cole Pedroza LLP as counsel of record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on November 10, 2021 by Henry Poe (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC721826; Trial Court Judge: Sahagun, Raul

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INFECTIOUS DISEASE ME is a litigant

Latest cases where PIONEER MIDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVENPORT CASSIDY COLE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARRUGIA DANIEL VINCENT