This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/07/2021 at 23:41:27 (UTC).

POBLETE v. SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 POBLETE filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9794

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Courthouse:

    California Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Benjamin Poblete

Inocencia Poblete

Respondents and Defendants

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

Bank of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

John S. Sargetis

Attorney at United Law Center

3301 Watt Avenue, Suite 500

Sacramento, CA 95821

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Jan T. Chilton

Attorney at Severson & Werson, APC

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including October 8, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC Attorney: Jan T. Chilton Defendant and Respondent: Bank of New York Attorney: Jan T. Chilton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: 1 file jacket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Benjamin Poblete Attorney: John S. Sargetis Plaintiff and Appellant: Inocencia Poblete Attorney: John S. Sargetis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C082815; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Placer County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: SCV0036635

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jan T. Chilton