This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/11/2022 at 22:14:13 (UTC).

Platinum Properties Investors Network, Inc. v. ROI Property Group, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Platinum Properties Investors Network, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against ROI Property Group, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCormick, Melissa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9075

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

McCormick, Melissa

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Platinum Properties Investors Network, Inc.

Respondents and Defendants

ROI Property Management, LLC

ROI Property Group, LLC

ROI Property Group 2, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc Y. Lazo

2646 Dupont Dr, Ste 60340

Irvine, CA 92612

Kimberly Anne Wright

Attorney at Revolve Law Group LLP

2601 Main St Ste 1200

Irvine, CA 92614-4240

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

James Edward Heffner

Attorney at Hahn Loeser & Parks, LLP

One America Plaza 600 West Broadway Suite 1500

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: All documents scanned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed pursuant to:; Notes: Appellant having filed a request for dismissal in this court, the appeal is DISMISSED. The remittitur shall issue forthwith. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: By aplt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Atty Marc Lazo SUB's OUT and Atty Kimberly A. Wright SUB's IN for aplt Platinum Properties Investors Network, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Augmentation denied.; Notes: The notice of appeal is from the judgment entered on January 27, 2020, which provided attorney fees and costs "if any, to be decided pursuant to timely-filed memoranda and appropriate motions." Appellant has moved to augment the record on appeal with documents filed in the superior court after entry of the judgment on appeal pertaining to post-judgment award of costs and attorney fees and the amended judgment including the award of attorney fees and costs, which appears to be a separately appealable post judgment order. (See Colony Hill v. Ghamaty (2006) 143 Cal.App.4th 1156, 1172; Norman I. Krug Real Estate Investments, Inc. v. Praszker (1990) 220 Cal.App.3d 35, 46 [postjudgment order awarding or denying costs or attorney fees separately appealable].) Appellant's motion to augment the record on appeal is DENIED. (See In re K.M. (2015) 242 Cal.App.4th 450, 456 [no augmentation with matters occurring during pendency of appeal].) This denial is without prejudice to appellant filing a request for judicial notice of the documents in compliance with California Rules of Court, rule 8.252 demonstrating the relevance of the documents to this appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: respondent's oppo to aplt's mtn to reinstate appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: Aplt's mtn to be relieved from default, vacate dismissal and reinstate appeal. CCIS submitted w/mtn but without a copy of the judgment and/or minute order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Apt needs to reinstate appeal before filing CCIS. CCIS is missing: a copy of jmt/minute order and all parties need to be added.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.140(b)(1), the appeal filed May 26, 2020, is DISMISSED for appellant's failure to designate the record on appeal in a timely manner. Appellant is advised that this dismissal will become final as to this court 30 days after the date of this order, at which time this court will lose the power to vacate, reconsider or modify it. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.264(b)(1).) A motion to vacate dismissal requires a showing of good cause. To allow the court sufficient time to review and evaluate the showing of good cause, a motion to vacate dismissal should be filed well before the 30-day jurisdictional deadline.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Notice of failure to comply w/notice of default re: designation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aplt Platium Properties Investors Network, Inc. Notice of appeal submitted in Superior Court on 03/27/2020 Notice of appeal processed in Superior Court on 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2018-00974280; Trial Court Judge: McCormick, Melissa

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROI PROPERTY GROUP 2, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where R.O.I. PROPERTIES, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee of the May Liquidating Trust and trustee of the estates of EPICENTER PARTNERS, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Anne Wright