This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/20/2022 at 00:42:53 (UTC).

Plata et al. v. The City of San Jose

Case Summary

On 08/06/2018 Plata filed an Other lawsuit against The City of San Jose. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kuhnle, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0385

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kuhnle, Thomas

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Raymond Plata

Michelle Plata

The City of San Jose

Defendant and Appellant

The City of San Jose

Amicus Curiae

The League of California Cities

Other

The Superior Court of Santa Clara

Attn: Hon. Thomas E. Kuhle 191 N. First Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Todd Schechter

Attorney at McManis Faulkner

50 W San Fernando St 10Th Fl

San Jose, CA 95113-2415

Richard Tyler Atkinson

Attorney at McManis Faulkner

Fairmont Plaza 50 W San Fernando St 10Th Fl

San Jose, CA 95113

James McManis

Attorney at McManis Faulkner

Fairmont Plaza 50 W San Fernando St 10Th Fl

San Jose, CA 95113

Kathryn Jennifer Zoglin

Attorney at San Jose City Attorney's Office

200 E Santa Clara St 16Th Fl

San Jose, CA 95113

J Richard Doyle

Attorney at Ofc Of The City Attorney

City Of San Jose 200 E Santa Clara St

San Jose, CA 95113-1905

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Kathryn Jennifer Zoglin

Attorney at San Jose City Attorney's Office

200 E Santa Clara St 16Th Fl

San Jose, CA 95113

J Richard Doyle

Attorney at Ofc Of The City Attorney

City Of San Jose 200 E Santa Clara St

San Jose, CA 95113-1905

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Sean Griffin Herman

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market Street 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

G060385

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review received.; Notes: Courtesy copy of answer by City of San Jose to petition for review filed in Supreme Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: By pltfs/ Aplts/ petitioners Raymond and Michelle Plata. S273586

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in part and reversed in part; Disposition Type: Final Affirmed in part and reversed in part. Bedsworth Marks Concurring and dissenting. Moore; Publication Status: Signed Published; Author: Bedsworth, William W.; Participants: Marks, Linda S. (Concur) Moore, Eileen C. (Concur with Opinion)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Published) Affirmed in part and reversed in part. Bedsworth Marks Concurring and dissenting. Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: Merits. Cause called. Matthew Schechter argued for appellants. Kathryn Zoglin argued for respondent. Cause submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On the court's own motion and for good cause, the parties are ordered to be prepared to discuss the following issues at oral argument: 1. Whether and to what extent the factual basis for the appellants' claim regarding the San Jose Municipal Water System's (Muni Water's) tiered rate structure was captured in the pre-litigation government claims filed with the City of San Jose, and specifically why or why not; 2. What acts or omissions by the City of San Jose would have been relevant to appellants' Proposition 218 claim as it relates to Muni Water's water rates generally, and how are those acts or omissions identical to, similar to, or different from, the acts or omissions relevant to an analysis of Muni Water's tiered rate structure specifically?Order called in.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Respondent's /cross appellant's notice of unavailability.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Atty Matthew Schechter will argue for appellants -30 minutes.

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: As to cross- appeal City of San Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.; Notes: As to City of San Jose

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: As to Plata et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.; Notes: Appellants' Raymond and Michelle Plata

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's Plata et al. missing copy of judgment for civil case information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Cross appeal City of San Jose, filed 8/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed 8/16/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellant Raymond Plata et al., Filed 8/6/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 2014-1-CV-258879; Trial Court Judge: Kuhnle, Thomas

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF SAN JOSE is a litigant

Latest cases where LEAGUE OF CALIFORNIA CITIES is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Santa Clara County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Griffin Herman