This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/18/2022 at 00:28:37 (UTC).

Plantier et al. v. Ramona Municipal Water District

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 Plantier filed an Other lawsuit against Ramona Municipal Water District. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pollack, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9529

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Pollack, Gregory

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Eugene G. Plantier

Progressive Properties Incorporated

Premium Development, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

Ramona Municipal Water District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Todd David Carpenter

Attorney at Carlson Lynch LLP

1350 Columbia St., Ste. 603

San Diego, CA 92101

Jennifer Michele French

Attorney at Patterson Law Group APC

1350 Columbia St Unit 603

San Diego, CA 92101-3456

James Richard Patterson

Attorney at Patterson Law Group

1350 Columbia St., Ste. 603

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

John D. Alessio

Attorney at Procopio Cory Hargreaves & Savitch, LLP

525 B Street Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Gregory V. Moser

Attorney at Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP

530 B Street Ste. 2100

San Diego, CA 92101

Adriana Raquel Ochoa

Attorney at Procopio, Cory, Hargreaves & Savitch LLP

525 B St Ste 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE FULLY BRIEFED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Eugene G. Plantier Attorney: Jennifer Michele French Plaintiff and Appellant: Progressive Properties Incorporated Attorney: Jennifer Michele French Plaintiff and Appellant: Premium Development, LLC Attorney: Jennifer Michele French

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Eugene G. PlantierAttorney: Jennifer Michele French Plaintiff and Appellant: Progressive Properties IncorporatedAttorney: Jennifer Michele French Plaintiff and Appellant: Premium Development, LLCAttorney: Jennifer Michele French

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: A/15 (In-person)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: R/15 (In-person)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.; Notes: 4/14/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Appendix and Respondent's Brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Ramona Municipal Water District Attorney: Adriana Raquel Ochoa 1 volume of appendix (37 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's Appendix and Respondent's Brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Ramona Municipal Water DistrictAttorney: Adriana Raquel Ochoa; Notes: 1 volume of appendix (37 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plantier et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: 10/19/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Superior court letter to counsel re designated RT's dated 09/28/2021 and 10/01/2021 will not be utilized because the dates fell after the submission of the Notice of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 10/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed on September 21, 2021 by Eugene G. Plantier et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2014-00083195-CU-BT-CTL; Trial Court Judge: Pollack, Gregory

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Premium Development, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Properties Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory V Moser