This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/20/2021 at 19:37:00 (UTC).

Pivotal Software, Inc. et al. v. Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 Pivotal Software, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cheng, Andrew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2228

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cheng, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Michael Dell

William Blair & Co., LLC

Khozema Z. Shipchandler

William D. Green

Samuel A. Ramirez & Co., Inc.

Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC

Zane Rowe

Cynthia Gaylor

Citigroup Global Markets , Inc.

Pivotal Software, Inc.

Dell Technologies, Inc.

Merrill Lynch. Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.

Wells Fargo Securities, LLC

Marcy S. Klevorn

Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC

Credit Suisse Securities, (USA) LLC

Paul Maritz

RBC Capital Markets, LLC

Interested Parties

Nhung Tran

Alandra Mothorpe

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

James Reid Sigel

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Mark Ryan Scott Foster

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market St

San Francisco, CA 94105-2406

Jordan David Eth

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market St

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Gidon Menahem Caine

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1950 University Avenue Suite 430

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Interested Party Attorneys

David William Hall

4 Embarcadero Ctr Ste 1400

San Francisco, CA 94111-4164

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens, Berman, Sobol & Shapiro

1301 2Nd Avenue., Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Reed Kathrein

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

715 Hearst Avenue, Suite 202

Berkeley, CA 94710

Danielle Smith

715 Hearst Ave Suite 202

Berkeley, CA 94710-1948

Other Attorneys

John T. Jasnoch

Attorney at Scott & Scott LLP

600 W. Broadway, Suite 3300

San Diego, CA 92101

Peretz Bronstein

Attorney at Bronstein, Gewirtz, & Grossman, LLC

60 East 42Nd Street, Suite 4600

New York, NY 10165

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received letter from:; Notes: US Supreme Court requesting record dated 9/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received letter from:; Notes: United States Supreme Court; petition for writ of certiorari GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received letter from:; Notes: SCOTUS re writ of certiorari

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The requests to appear as counsel pro hac vice are granted. The petition for review and application for stay are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: Filed in the California Supreme Court by Morrison & Foerster, attorneys for Pivotal Software

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate and accompanying stay request are denied. * Before Simons, Acting P.J., Burns, J. and Seligman, J. (Judge of the Alameda County Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate and accompanying stay request are denied. * Before Simons, Acting P.J., Burns, J. and Seligman, J. (Judge of the Alameda County Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid through Truefiling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibits A - N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate Request for Immediate Stay of Order Permitting Ongoing Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dell Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SAMUEL A. RAMIREZ & CO., INC is a litigant

Latest cases where RBC Capital Markets LLC is a litigant