This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/06/2022 at 14:00:26 (UTC).

Pittsburg Unified School District v. Superior Court for the County of Contra Costa

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 Pittsburg Unified School District filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the County of Contra Costa. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weil, Edward. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5051

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Weil, Edward

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pittsburg Unified School District

Respondent

Superior Court for the County of Contra Costa

Interested Parties

Mark S.

Rosa T.

Jessica Black

Michell Redfoot

Nefertari Royston, Dr.

Others

California Department of Education

State Board of Education

Tony Thurmond

State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Katherine Ann Alberts

Attorney at LEONE & ALBERTS

1390 Willow Pass Rd., Suite 700

Concord, CA 94520

Jimmie Emile Johnson

Attorney at Leone & Alberts APC

1390 Willow Pass Rd Ste 700

Concord, CA 94520-7913

Interested Party Attorneys

Brandon Lashawn Greene

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Northern California

39 Drumm St.

San Francisco, CA 94111

Linnea L Nelson

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union

39 Drumm St

San Francisco, CA 94111

Grayce S. Zelphin

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA

39 Drumm St.

San Francisco, CA 94111

Ana Graciela Najera Mendoza

Attorney at ACLU Foundation of Southern California

1313 W 8Th St Ste 200

Los Angeles, CA 90017-4441

Claudia Center

Attorney at Disability Rights Education & Defense Fund

3075 Adeline Street, Suite 210

Berkeley, CA 94703

Malhar Parimal Shah

Attorney at DREDF

3075 Adeline St Ste 210

Berkeley, CA 94703-2578

Robyn Carrico Crowther

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

633 W. Fifth Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Amanda Carolyne Schwartz

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

One Market Plaza Spear Tower, Suite 3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

Victor Leung

Attorney at ACLU of Southern California

1313 W 8Th St

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Other Attorneys

Virginia Gay Cale

Attorney at Deputy General Counsel

1430 N Street, Suite 5319

Sacramento, CA 95814

Leonard Bruce Garfinkel

Attorney at California Dept of Education

1430 N St Ste 5319

Sacramento, CA 95814

Amy Elizabeth Bisson-Holloway

Attorney at Dept Of Education/Legal Ofc

1430 N Street, Suite 5319

Sacramento, CA 95814

Jacquelyn Young

Attorney at Dept of Justice

Office Of The Attorney General 300 S Spring St

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Andrew Zachary Edelstein

Attorney at Deputy Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT: The Petition for Writ of Mandate or Prohibition and Request for Stay are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: The Petition for Writ of Mandate or Prohibition and Request for Stay are denied. (tuc,fuj,pet)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: REPLY TO PRELIMINARY OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE OR PROHIBITION By petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: "reply to preliminary opposition to petition for writ of mandate and/or prohibition or other appropriate relief and request for immediate stay"California Department of Education and State Board of Education

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: "Preliminary Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate and/or Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief and Request for Immediate Stay"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: RPI's letter; re notice of intent to file oppo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: RPI's letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid through Truefiling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibits A - G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate or Prohibition Stay Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; County: Contra Costa; Trial Court Case Number: MSN211755; Trial Court Judge: Weil, Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PITTSBURG UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION is a litigant

Latest cases where California Department of Education is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF CALIFORNA is a litigant