This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/26/2023 at 04:10:34 (UTC).

Pinnacle Foods of Bakersfield, LLC v. Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 Pinnacle Foods of Bakersfield, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin, Lia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4083

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Martin, Lia

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Pinnacle Foods of Bakersfield, LLC

Defendants and Respondents

Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.

1221 Chicken LLC

1449 Chicken, LLC

2700 Chicken, LLC

705 Chicken, LLC

9606 Chicken, LLC

Respondents and Defendants

1221 Chicken LLC

1449 Chicken, LLC

2700 Chicken, LLC

705 Chicken, LLC

9606 Chicken, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

James M. Mulcahy

Attorney at Mulcahy LLP

4 Park Plz Ste 1950

Irvine, CA 92614

Filemon Carrillo

Attorney at Mulcahy LLP

4 Park Plaza Ste 1230

Irvine, CA 92614

Sandra Greiner Gibbs

Attorney at Mulcahy LLP

4 Park Plaza Suite 1950

Irvine, CA 92614

Jazlyn Cabula

Attorney at Mulcahy LLP

4 Park Plaza Suite 1950

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Gregg Zucker

Attorney at FOUNDATION LAW GROUP LLP

2049 Century Park E Ste 2460

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3126

Michael S. Wildermuth

Attorney at Nevers, Palazzo, Packard, Wildermuth & Wynner

31248 Oak Crest Drive Suite 100

Westlake Village, CA 91361

John Rearden Bamford

Attorney at Nevers Palazzo Packard Wildermuth & Wynner PC

31248 Oak Crest Dr Ste 100

Westlake Village, CA 91361-5671

Victor Ruben Balladares

Attorney at Nevers Pallazo Packard Wildermuth & Wynner, PC

31248 Oak Crest Dr., Suite 200

Westlake Village, CA 91361

John Anthony Hribar

Attorney at Ferguson Case Orr Paterson LLP

1050 South Kimball Road

Ventura, CA 93004

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 05/22/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Pinnacle Foods of Bakersfield, LLC Attorney: Filemon Carrillo *** Two volumes of exhibits ***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 05/22/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: 1221 Chicken LLCAttorney: John Anthony Hribar Attorney: John Rearden Bamford Attorney: Michael S. Wildermuth Attorney: Victor Ruben Balladares Defendant and Respondent: 1449 Chicken, LLC Defendant and Respondent: 2700 Chicken, LLC Defendant and Respondent: 705 Chicken, LLC Defendant and Respondent: 9606 Chicken, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Pinnacle Foods of Bakersfield, LLCAttorney: Filemon Carrillo; Notes: *** Two volumes of exhibits ***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: notice designating record on appeal filed 10/20/2022 SCLA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Respondents associate as co-counsel John A. Hribar.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Pinnacle Foods of Bakersfield, LLC Attorney: Filemon Carrillo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Pinnacle Foods of Bakersfield, LLCAttorney: Filemon Carrillo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid via credit card for Pinnacle Foods of Bakersfield, LLC .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed Oct 11, 2022 by Pinnacle Foods of Bakersfield, LLC et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV35404; Trial Court Judge: Martin, Lia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less