This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/31/2021 at 06:16:37 (UTC).

Pieper v. 640 Octavia, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 Pieper filed an Other lawsuit against 640 Octavia, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Haines, Charles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1980

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Haines, Charles

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Kalle Karl-Heinz Pieper

Defendants and Appellants

Justin Hutto

Neil Martinson

640 Octavia, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Yosef Peretz

Attorney at Peretz & Associates

22 Battery Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Herschel Bornstein

Attorney at Bornstein & Bornstein Law Group

2701 Telegraph Ave., Suite 200

Oakland, CA 94612

Erika Kalbermatter Bornstein

Attorney at Bornstein & Bornstein Law Group

2701 Telegraph Ave Ste 200

Oakland, CA 94612-1715

William K. Blakemore

Attorney at Donahue, Bates, Blakemore & Mackey

P.O. Box 277010

Sacramento, CA 95827

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Co. Clerk's Estimate of Cost of Appeal Record; total $1,072.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: via credit card

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Neil Martinson Attorney: Jonathan Herschel Bornstein J. Bornstein, attorney for appellants, w/copy of order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.; Notes: needs copy of order or judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Neil Martinson Attorney: Erika Kalbermatter Bornstein Jonathan Bornstein, attorney for appellants, w/o copy of order or judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Neil MartinsonAttorney: Jonathan Herschel Bornstein; Notes: J. Bornstein, attorney for appellants, w/copy of order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Neil MartinsonAttorney: Erika Kalbermatter Bornstein; Notes: Jonathan Bornstein, attorney for appellants, w/o copy of order or judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • HearingDescription: Order to show cause - court reporter or atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: J. Bornstein and E. Bornstein, counsel for appellant, re: Today, the default notice for failure to file the Civil Case Information Statement issued via TrueFiling. The due date is now March 19, 2021, and failure to file the Civil Case Information Statement by that date may result in dismissal of this appeal. This court's filing fee of $775.00 has not been paid and was due at the time of the filing on the notice of appeal. On February 11, 2021, this court issued the default notice for the filing fee, due March 3, 2021. If the filing fee is not paid or a request for waiver of court fees is not filed on or before March 19, 2021, the dismissal order for failure to pay this court's filing fee will be prepared.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 01/15/2021 by Counsel for Defendants Neil Martinson and Justin Hutto appealing judgment from 12/08/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC18571890; Trial Court Judge: Haines, Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 640 Octavia, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERETZ, YOSEF