This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/19/2021 at 15:18:18 (UTC).

Pieper et al. v. Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 Pieper filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Haines, Charles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2505

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Haines, Charles

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Kalle Karl-Heinz Pieper

Jose Montoya

Respondent

Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Party

640 Octavia, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Yosef Peretz

Attorney at Peretz & Associates

22 Battery Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Interested Party Attorneys

Scott Ariel Freedman

Attorney at Zacks, Freedman & Patterson P.C.

235 Montgomery Street - Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Shoshana J. Raphael

Attorney at Zacks, Freedman & Patterson, P.C.

235 Montgomery St Ste 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate or other appropriate relief is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate or other appropriate relief is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid through Truefiing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibits 1 - 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate or Other Appropriate Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CUD21667662; Trial Court Judge: Haines, Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 640 Octavia, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERETZ, YOSEF