This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/02/2021 at 00:23:47 (UTC).

PHL Variable Insurance Company v. Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 PHL Variable Insurance Company filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ulmer, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1236

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ulmer, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PHL Variable Insurance Company

Respondent

Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Parties

Alan G. Chan

Anna Martin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party and Petitioner Attorneys

Duane C. Musfelt

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith

333 Bush Street - Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104-2872

Ryan Hideki Opgenorth

Attorney at Pillsbury & Coleman LLP

600 Montgomery St Fl 31

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jodi Krystyn Swick

Attorney at Edison, McDowell & Hetherington, LLP

1 Kaiser Plaza, Suite 340

Oakland, CA 94612

Kendall Alexander Layne

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

333 Bush Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Terrence Joseph Coleman

Attorney at Pillsbury & Coleman LLP

600 Montgomery Street - 31St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • HearingDescription: Shipped to state retention center, box # / list #:; Notes: ***Note: Entire file electronic***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate and/or other appropriate relief is denied. The request for a stay is denied. * Pollak, P.J., Streeter, J., and Tucher, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: as to Swick's 11.3.20 ltr.;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: from Jodi K. Swick; dated 11.3.20;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid through Truefiling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 5 of 5, PP. 1131- 1414

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 4 of 5, PP. 0844-1130

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 3 of 5, PP. 0570-0843

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 2 of 5, PP. 0287-0569

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 1 of 5, PP. 0001-0286

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate and/or Other Appropriate Relief Immediate Relief Requested for November 9, 2020 Trial Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC19572956; Trial Court Judge: Ulmer, Jr., Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHL Variable Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Hideki Opgenorth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUSFELT, DUANE C.