This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/12/2021 at 06:56:49 (UTC).

PHL ASSOCIATES v. S.C. (WALLIS)

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 PHL ASSOCIATES filed an Other lawsuit against C WALLIS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4120

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PHL Associates, Inc.

Respondent

Superior Court of Yolo County

Honorable Daniel Mcguire 1000 Main Street

Woodland, CA 95695

Interested Party

Dale Wallis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Klaus J. Kolb

Attorney at Attorney at Law

13620 Lincoln Way, Suite 370

Auburn, CA 95603

Tory E. Griffin

Attorney at Jeppson & Griffin, LLP

1478 Stone Point Drive, Suite 100

Roseville, CA 95661

Interested Party Attorneys

Timothy T. Coates

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Mary E. Greene

Attorney at Law Offices of Mary E. Greene

555 University Avenue, Suite 275

Sacramento, CA 95825

Trevor J. Newhouse

Attorney at Law Offices of Mary E. Greene

555 University Avenue, Suite 275

Sacramento, CA 95825

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 file jacket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Dale Wallis Attorney: Timothy T. Coates

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: PHL Associates, Inc. Attorney: Klaus J. Kolb Attorney: Tory E. Griffin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One file jacket.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Notice of Association of Counsel -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- Dale Wallis, Real Party in Interest Timothy T. Coates, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Dale Wallis Attorney: Timothy T. Coates

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C088437; Disposition: Petition granted by opinion; Trial Court: Yolo County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 06CV72352

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less