This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/31/2022 at 05:05:07 (UTC).

Phillip v. Quality Inn & Suites et al.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 Phillip filed an Other lawsuit against Quality Inn Suites. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Murillo, Serena. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9100

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Murillo, Serena

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Christopher Phillip

Respondents and Defendants

Quality Inn & Suites

Nishant Shah

Bell Gardens Hospitality LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Ilan N. Janfaza

Attorney at Law Offices of Ilan N Rosen Janfaza

9025 Wilshire Blvd Penthouse Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Philip H. Stillman

Attorney at Stillman & Associates

3015 North Bay Road Suite B

Miami Beach, FL 33140

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's fee waiver application submitted on Apr 21, 2022 via truefiling has been rejected. Application is incomplete. Please provide a response to Question 5.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's fee waiver application submitted on Apr 3, 2022 via truefiling has been rejected. Application is incomplete. Please provide a response to Question 5.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Christopher Phillip Attorney: Ilan N. Janfaza

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Christopher PhillipAttorney: Ilan N. Janfaza

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on February 22, 2022 by Christopher Phillip

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC720001; Trial Court Judge: Murillo, Serena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUALITY INN & SUITES is a litigant

Latest cases where BELL GARDENS HOSPITALITY LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STILLMAN PHILIP H.