This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/18/2023 at 18:01:31 (UTC).

Phi v. Reyes et al.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Phi filed an Other lawsuit against Reyes. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Duffy-Lewis, Maureen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6335

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Duffy-Lewis, Maureen

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

John Phi

Respondents and Defendants

Bridgette Reyes

Carlos Martinez

Lauren Sangmi Horiuchi

Misrak Woldekian

1100 S. Alvarado Street, LLC dba Olympia Convalescent Hospital

Other

Rule 8.29

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Lann G. Mc Intyre

Christopher G. Washington

Daniel R. Velladao

David Zee Sohn

Adam L. Robinson

Kenneth R. Pedroza

Debra E. Cardarelli

Other Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Request for extension of time submitted Aug 29, 2023 via Truefiling has been rejected. There are no pending actions in this appeal. The appeal was dismissed on July 15, 2022. Remittitur was issued on Sept 15, 2023. This court does not have jurisdiction to rule on this matter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Request for extension of time submitted July 31, 2023 via Truefiling has been rejected. There are no pending actions in this appeal. The appeal was dismissed on July 15, 2022. Remittitur was issued on Sept 15, 2023. This court does not have jurisdiction to rule on this matter. (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Request for extension of time submitted June 29, 2023 via Truefiling has been rejected. There are no pending actions in this appeal. The appeal was dismissed on July 15, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Request for extension of time submitted May 30, 2023 via truefiling has been rejected. There are no pending actions in this appeal. The appeal was dismissed on July 15, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Request for extension of time submitted Apr 28, 2023 via truefiling has been rejected. There are no pending actions in this appeal. The appeal was dismissed on July 15, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Application for extension of time to file opening brief submitted via OnBase (March 29, 2023) rejected due to appeal was dismissed on July 15, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Application for extension of time to file opening brief submitted via OnBase (February 27, 2023) rejected due to appeal was dismissed on July 15, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Application for extension of time to file opening brief submitted via OnBase (January 26, 2023) rejected due to appeal was dismissed on July 15, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Application for extension of time to file opening brief submitted via OnBase (12/27/2022) rejected due to appeal was dismissed on 07/15/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Application for extension of time to file opening brief submitted via OnBase (11/25/2022) rejected due to appeal was dismissed on 07/15/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Daniel R. Velladao and Lann G. McIntyre of Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP associate in as counsel of record for Respondents Bridgette Reyes, et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: John Phi Pro Per (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: There are two appeals (Oct 4, 2021 and Nov 9, 2021) for case B316335. Appellant's submission does not specify to which appeal the extension request should be applied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: John PhiPro Per; Notes: (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Defendant and Respondent CARLOS MARTINEZ, M.D. hereby associates David Sohn and Kenneth Pedroza of COLE PEDROZA LLP as counsel of record.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on November 19, 2021 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Nov 9, 2021 by John Phi (U1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Fee waiver granted on 7/22/2021 in case no. B313625(U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on October 4, 2021 by John Phi (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV05886; Trial Court Judge: Duffy-Lewis, Maureen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less