This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/08/2023 at 00:28:03 (UTC).

Pfeister v. Wetzel et al.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 Pfeister filed an Other lawsuit against Wetzel. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Haines, Charles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5508

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Haines, Charles

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Joanna L. Pfeister

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendants and Appellants

David Wetzel

Stephen Rogers

Giampaolo D'errico

Other

Gramercy Tower Condominium Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Adrian Gerard Driscoll

Attorney at Murphy Pearson Bradley & Feeney

580 California Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

James A. Lassart

Attorney at Murphy, Pearson, Bradley & Feeney

580 California Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Carrie Netterville Heieck

Attorney at Tinnelly Law Group

27101 Puerta Real Suite 250

Mission Viejo, CA 92691

Cang N. Le

Attorney at Tinnelly Law Group

6185 27101 Puerta Real , Suite 250

Mission Viejo, CA 92691

Other Attorneys

P. Christian Scheley

Attorney at Clapp, Moroney, Bellagamba, Et Al.

1111 Bayhill Dr., Ste. 300

San Bruno, CA 94066

Joseph William Strella

Attorney at Clapp, Moroney, Bellagamba & Vucinich

1111 Bayhill Drive - Suite 300

San Bruno, CA 94066

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 04/07/2023 By 60 Day(s) Respondent's brief stipulated to 4/07/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: David Wetzel Attorney: Cang N. Le One extension granted for a total of 60 days: 10/19/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 01/06/2023 By 60 Day(s) 10/19/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 01/06/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 04/07/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Joanna L. PfeisterAttorney: Adrian Gerard Driscoll

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: David WetzelAttorney: Cang N. Le; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 60 days: 10/19/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 01/06/2023 By 60 Day(s) 10/19/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 01/06/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Joanna Pfeister, formerly in Propria Persona, now represented.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of county clerk filed.; Notes: Clerk's certificate of transmittal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: supplemental clerk's transcript filed; Notes: Supplemental CT - Vols. 1-12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: David Wetzel Attorney: Cang N. Le

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil Case Information Statement Missing Order or Judgement being appealed Received 7/13/22 Rejected 7/14/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: David WetzelAttorney: Cang N. Le

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Appellant's Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: Filed in the superior court on July 7, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid by InfoTrack US Inc., check 5024640

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 06/20/2022 by Counsel for Defendants David Wetzel, Stephen Rogers and Giampaolo D'errico appealing judgment from 05/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC20586621; Trial Court Judge: Haines, Charles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less