This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/29/2022 at 02:18:11 (UTC).

Pfeister v. Gramercy Tower Condominium Association

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 Pfeister filed an Other lawsuit against Gramercy Tower Condominium Association. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kane, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4167

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kane, Robert

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Joanna L. Pfeister

San Francisco, CA 94108

Respondent and Defendant

Gramercy Tower Condominium Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

P. Christian Scheley

Attorney at Clapp, Moroney, Bellagamba, Et Al.

1111 Bayhill Dr., Ste. 300

San Bruno, CA 94066

Joseph William Strella

Attorney at Clapp, Moroney, Bellagamba & Vucinich

1111 Bayhill Drive - Suite 300

San Bruno, CA 94066

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: Order to show cause - court reporter or atty.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Joanna L. Pfeister Pro Per Order attached.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS returned with message: Please resubmit filling in the top portion of form.Appellant in Propria Persona was also emailed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Joanna L. PfeisterPro Per; Notes: Order attached.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 12/02/2021. Designating CT with RT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 12/02/2021 by Plaintiff Joanna L. Pfeister in propria persona appealing order from 12/02/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC20586621; Trial Court Judge: Kane, Robert

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less