This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/27/2023 at 04:09:58 (UTC).

P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. et al. v. American Guarantee and Liability Insurance

Case Summary

On 10/13/2022 P F Chang's China Bistro, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against American Guarantee and Liability Insurance. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mackey, Malcolm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4109

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mackey, Malcolm

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.

PFC Associates LLC

Respondent and Defendant

American Guarantee and Liability Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Alan Kiburtz

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Heather W Habes

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Fl 35

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4643

Reynold Lloyd Siemens

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Christina Carroll

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

900 K Street Nw

Washinton, DC 20006

Shari Klevens

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washigton, DC 20006

Jeffry Samuel Butler

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

1999 Harrison St, Ste 1300

Oakland, CA 94612

Laurie J. Hepler

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

50 California Street, Suite 1500

San Francisco, CA 94111

Stefan Caris Love

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 03/06/2023 By 62 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice granted; Notes: The Motion for Shari L. Klevens to appear as counsel pro hac vice for the purpose of representing respondent is granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice granted; Notes: The Motion for Christina M. Carroll to appear as counsel pro hac vice for the purpose of representing respondent is granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Ruling on motion.; Notes: The court has read and considered respondent's motion to consolidate appeals for oral argument filed November 14, 2022. The motion is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: Motion to admit Christina M. Carroll as counsel pro hac vice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: Motion to Admit Shari L. Klevens as counsel pro hac vice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The notice of election to proceed pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.124 has been received and assigned the above case number. Appellant did not serve and file a notice to prepare a reporter's transcript. The appendix and opening brief are due within 70 days from the filing of the notice of election with the trial court (California Rules of Court, rule 8.212(a)(1)(B)).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Oct. 24, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: This Court has received appellant's notice of appeal. The case has been assigned the above referenced number. Any counsel who are not licensed to practice in the State of California and intend to appear in or file any documents with this Court must first file an application to appear pro hac vice pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 9.40(c)(2). This application must be made to this Court regardless of any previous order granting pro hac vice appearance filed in the trial court. A new application to appear as counsel pro hac vice made to this Court must conform to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.54. Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 9.40(e), payment of the required fee is to be made to California State Bar and a statement regarding payment must be indicated in the application to this Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: motion to consolidate appeals for oral argument filed by respondent American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Co.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. Attorney: Heather W Habes Plaintiff and Appellant: PFC Associates LLC Attorney: Heather W Habes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 03/06/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.Attorney: Heather W Habes Attorney: Jeffrey Alan Kiburtz Attorney: Reynold Lloyd Siemens Plaintiff and Appellant: PFC Associates LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.Attorney: Heather W Habes Plaintiff and Appellant: PFC Associates LLCAttorney: Heather W Habes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Jonathan Gross of Mound,Cotton, Wollan & Greengrass LLP substitutes OUT as counsel for respondent American Guarantee and Liability Insurance. Laurie J. Hepler and Stefan C. Love of Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP substitutes IN as counsel of record for respondent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #1038621 for $775 from lasc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed October 13, 2022 by P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. and PFC Associates LLC. (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV17169; Trial Court Judge: Mackey, Malcolm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where P.F. CHANG'S CHINA BISTRO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christina Carroll