This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/18/2022 at 00:05:22 (UTC).

Peterson v. Harris et al.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Peterson filed an Other lawsuit against Harris. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sotelo, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5356

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sotelo, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Sabrina Peterson

Appellants and Defendants

Clifford Harris

Tameka Harris

Shekinah Anderson

Atlanta, GA 30331

Not Yet Classified

Phyllis Cheng

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent, Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Rodney Sean Diggs

444 S Flower St Ste 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

William B. DeClercq

445 S Figueroa Street Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1635

Rodney S. Diggs

Attorney at Ivie, McNeill, Wyatt, Purcell & Diggs

444 S Flower St Ste 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kelsey J. Leeker

Attorney at Lavely & Singer

2049 Century Park E Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3126

Andrew Brad Brettler

2049 Century Park East Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Andrew B. Brettler

Attorney at Lavely & Singer

2049 Century Park East Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kelsey Jordan Leeker

2049 Century Park E Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3126

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief. Due on 07/18/2022 By 60 Day(s) ext aob to 7/18/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief. Requested for 07/18/2022 By 60 Day(s) to ext aob to 7/18/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Appellant Shekinah Anderson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Clifford Harris Attorney: Andrew B. Brettler Attorney: Kelsey J. Leeker Defendant and Appellant: Tameka Harris Attorney: Andrew B. Brettler Attorney: Kelsey J. Leeker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Appellant Shekinah Anderson, self represented in place of Declercq Law Group, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Due Date: 07/18/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Shekinah AndersonPro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Clifford HarrisAttorney: Andrew B. Brettler Attorney: Kelsey J. Leeker Defendant and Appellant: Tameka HarrisAttorney: Andrew B. Brettler Attorney: Kelsey J. Leeker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-2 (521 Pages) R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check#5000484 for $775.00 (for appeal filed 10/27/2021 by Shekinah Jo Anderson) ("U")

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on December 01, 2021 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).) ("U")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Settlement conference requested by:; Notes: appellant Anderson.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 10/27/2021 by Shekinah Jo Anderson ("U")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Settlement conference scheduled for:; Notes: December 15, 2021 at 10:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check# 1054027 for $775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Clifford Harris Attorney: Kelsey J. Leeker Defendant and Appellant: Tameka Harris Attorney: Kelsey J. Leeker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Clifford HarrisAttorney: Kelsey J. Leeker Defendant and Appellant: Tameka HarrisAttorney: Kelsey J. Leeker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Request for mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Sept. 19, 2021: Clifford Harris, et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV07836; Trial Court Judge: Sotelo, David

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEEKER KELSEY JORDAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DECLERCQ WILLIAM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRETTLER ANDREW B