This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/07/2022 at 00:43:48 (UTC).

Peskett v. Designer Brands, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 Peskett filed an Other lawsuit against Designer Brands, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Highberger, William. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0708

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Highberger, William

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Sharon Peskett

Defendant and Appellant

Designer Brands, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Michael S. Hilicki

55 W. Monroe St, Suite 3390

Chicago, IL 60603

Keith J. Keogh

55 W. Monroe St, Suite 3390

Chicago, IL 60603

Joseph M Hekmat

Attorney at Hekmat Law Group, P.C.

9701 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1000

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Teresa Carey Chow

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Blvd. Ste 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the application for pro hac vice admission of Keith J. Keogh to appear as counsel for respondent filed on July 14, 2022. Good cause appearing, the application is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the application for pro hac vice admission of Michael S. Hilicki to appear as counsel for respondent filed on July 14, 2022. Good cause appearing, the application is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: Keith J. Keogh of Keogh Law, LTD as co-counsel for plaintiff and respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: Michael S. Hilicki of Keogh Law, LTD as co-counsel for plaintiff and respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed change of firm name.; Notes: Change of firm name for Respondent's counsel Joseph M. Hekmat: Hekmat Law Group, P.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Designer Brands, Inc. Attorney: Teresa Carey Chow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Designer Brands, Inc.Attorney: Teresa Carey Chow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated May 16, 2022: 8.122 w. RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #225592 for $775 (ACE Attorney Service, Inc.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on May 6, 2022 by Designer Brands, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV38324; Trial Court Judge: Highberger, William

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DESIGNER BRANDS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOW TERESA C.