This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/10/2022 at 12:19:52 (UTC).

PERRY v. S.C. (NP PARC CHATEAUX)

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 PERRY filed an Other lawsuit against C NP PARC CHATEAUX. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8057

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michael (Moshe) Perry

West Hills, CA 91307

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Parties

Appellate Division of the Superior Courts

NP Parc Chateaux, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Tania Kim Cardoso

Attorney at Hollenbeck & Cardoso, LLP

7755 Center Avenue, Suite 1100

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Third document entitled amended petitioner's motion pursuant to CRC, rule 3.515. Michael (Moshe) Perry, Petitioner Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Second document entitled amended petitioner's motion pursuant to CRC, rule 3.515. Michael (Moshe) Perry, Petitioner Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Document entitled amended petitioner's motion pursuant to CRC, rule 3.515. Michael (Moshe) Perry, Petitioner Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Document entitled Petitioner's motion pursuant to CRC, rule 3.515. Michael (Moshe) Perry, Petitioner Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Michael (Moshe) Perry Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Dear Mr. Perry: The court has considered your application to file an overlength petition for review which we received electronically on April 6, 2021. Your application to file an overlength petition has been denied. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.504 (d).) With the court's permission, you must resubmit a new petition for review not exceeding the 8,400 words on or before April 12, 2021. In addition, you must also submit the filing fee for a petition for review which is $710 or submit a properly completed FW -001 form with information that demonstrates that you are eligible for a fee waiver. You have Ten (10) days from the date of this notice to pay your fees and costs, or submit your fee waiver, failure to do so may result in the court striking the filing of your petition for review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application to file over-length brief denied; Notes: Michael (Moshe) Perry, Petitioner Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application to file over-length brief filed; Notes: Michael (Moshe) Perry, Petitioner Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received oversized petition for review; Notes: Petitioner: Michael (Moshe) Perry Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 8; Court of Appeal Case Number: B311362; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20CHUD00033

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NP Parc Chateaux, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Appellate Division of the Superior Court is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP - TANIA CARDOSO