This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/04/2021 at 14:50:39 (UTC).

Perry v. NP PARC CHATEAUX, LLC. et al.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 Perry filed an Other lawsuit against NP PARC CHATEAUX, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Taylor, Tricia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3036

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Taylor, Tricia

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

NP PARC CHATEAUX, LLC.

A Subsidiary of Alliance Residential & Commercial, Inc.

ALLRESCO

Alex Villanueva

Appellants and Defendants

Moshe Michael A. Perry

West Hills, CA 91307

NP PARC CHATEAUX, LLC.

A Subsidiary of Alliance Residential & Commercial, Inc.

ALLRESCO

Alex Villanueva

Respondents

The Appellate Division

Superior Court Of Los Angeles 111 N Hill Street, Rm 607

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Tricia J. Taylor

Chatsworth, CA 91311

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Tania Kim Cardoso

Attorney at Hollenbeck & Cardoso, LLP

7755 Center Ave, Ste 1100

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

Respondent Attorneys

The Honorable Patti Jo McKay

Attorney at Appellate Division Los Angeles Superior Court

111 N. Hill Street, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Transfer/certification denied; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Transfer/certification denied.; Notes: We have read and considered defendant's "Petition En Banc Transfer this Appeal to the Court of Appeal from the Appellate Division Pursuant to CRC 8.1006, with Issues and Matters Sought to be Certified, Concurrently with a Petition for Certiorari En Banc for Extraordinary Relief . . . ." filed on June 15, 2021. We have also read and considered defendant's application to "combine a petition for transfer with a petition of certiorari . . . ." filed on the same date. The application to combine the two petitions is granted. As we indicated in our prior orders, petitioner failed to first seek certification for transfer from the Appellate Division, and show such transfer was denied, which is a prerequisite to seeking transfer from this court. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.1006(a).) Even if petitioner had satisfied that prerequisite, he has nonetheless failed to demonstrate this case satisfies the requirements for transfer under Rule 8.1002. (See Case Nos. B312708 & 312746.) Further, there is no basis for certiorari. Accordingly, the combined petition is denied. Grimes-Stratton-Wiley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: Petition for transfer with a STAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: Request to waive court fees. (Order is not included)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Appellants application from the Court of Appeal to combine a petition for transfer with a petition of certiorari. (Petition to file oversized brief/petition)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NP Parc Chateaux, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Appellate Division of the Superior Court is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frederick Bennett