This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/12/2023 at 04:12:33 (UTC).

Perez v. Fam, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 Perez filed an Other lawsuit against Fam, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Freeman, Kenneth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1157

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Freeman, Kenneth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Fidel Perez

Appellant and Defendant

Fam, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Kelsey McCullough Szamet

Ariel J. Stiller-Shulman

Eric B. Kingsley

Jessica L. Adlouni

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Christian Joseph Scali

Eric Paul Weiss

Colleen M O'Brien

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Each side shall bear its own costs on appeal, however, Perez reserves the right to seek fees and costs relating to the Appeal at the conclusion of the action pursuant to the allegations in the operative complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to the joint stipulation by parties, the appeal filed May 12, 2022, is dismissed. The remittitur to issue forthwith.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Stipulation to dismiss appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Responsive filing fee paid via credit card for Respondent Perez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: Respondent Perez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Fidel Perez Attorney: Ariel J. Stiller-Shulman Attorney: Eric B. Kingsley Attorney: Jessica L. Adlouni Two extensions granted for a total of 50 days: 04/24/2023 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 06/02/2023 By 30 Day(s) 05/30/2023 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 06/22/2023 By 20 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Respondent's notice of appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Stipulation rejected, respondent's signature is not counsel on record.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Fam, LLC Attorney: Christian Joseph Scali Attorney: Colleen M O'Brien

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Fam, LLCAttorney: Christian Joseph Scali Attorney: Colleen M O'Brien

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated June 2, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #1370 for $775 (Scali Rasmussen)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on May 12, 2022 by Fam, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV33308; Trial Court Judge: Freeman, Kenneth

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less