This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/20/2022 at 03:12:12 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. ZORNS

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ZORNS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5715

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Richard Louis Zorns

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Heidi Salerno

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S. Spring Street Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1413

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

John Lanahan

Attorney at Attorney at Law

501 West Broadway, Suite 1510

San Diego, CA 92101-3568

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Richard Louis Zorns Attorney: John Lanahan **FILED WITH PERMISSION**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Timely petition for review. Not in compliance, counsel asked to re-submit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: B308967; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: PA003868

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Lanahan