This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/23/2022 at 05:07:12 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. YOUNG

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against YOUNG. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5723

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Norman Young

San Luis Obispo, CA 93409

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Attorney General - Los Angeles Office

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 5000

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: one file jacket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One file jacket.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record has been imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Norman Young Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 5; Court of Appeal Case Number: B314935; Disposition: Dismissed by opinion; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BA112790

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant