This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/30/2022 at 13:57:17 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. YOUNG

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against YOUNG. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9382

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Chevelle R. Young

Stockton, CA 95213

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

James Henry Flaherty

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

600 West Broadway, Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Michelle T. LiVecchi-Raufi

Attorney at The Law Offices of Michelle T. LiVecchi-Raufi

28562 Oso Parkway, Suite 429

Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied without prejudice to any relief to which defendant might be entitled after this court decides People v. Kopp, S257844.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Chevelle R. Young Attorney: Michelle T. LiVecchi-Raufi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Chevelle R. Young Attorney: Michelle T. LiVecchi-Raufi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B302431; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: SA101002

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle Theresa Livecchi-Raufi