This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/26/2021 at 06:26:49 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. WELLS

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WELLS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7596

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

James Carter Wells

Soledad, CA 93960

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Lewis A. Martinez

Attorney at Office of The Attorney General

2550 Mariposa Mall, Room 5090

Fresno, CA 93721

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Rachel Varnell

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 799

Los Gatos, CA 95031

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: James Carter Wells Attorney: Rachel Varnell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: James Carter Wells Attorney: Rachel Varnell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fifth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: F080461; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Fresno County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: F14903226

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel Paige Varnell