This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/12/2021 at 01:56:31 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. VENABLE

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against VENABLE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8296

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    California Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Elvis Venable, Jr.

Delano, CA 93216

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

James M. Crawford

Attorney at James M. Crawford Attorney at Law

528 North Glassell Avenue

Orange, CA 92867

Aaron Spolin

Attorney at Spolin Law P.C.

11500 West Olympic Boulevard, Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: 1 doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Elvis Venable, Jr. Attorney: Aaron Spolin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 6; Court of Appeal Case Number: B306069; Disposition: Affirmed with modifications; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: TA039602

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAWFORD, JAMES M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron Spolin