This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 07/03/2022 at 21:07:14 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. TRUJILLO

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TRUJILLO. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4658

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Salvador Trujillo

Imperial, CA 92251

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Rama R. Maline

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Barbara Smith

Attorney at Attorney ar Law

8359 Elk Grove Florin Road Suite No. 103-305

Sacramento, CA 95829

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: one doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Salvador Trujillo Attorney: Barbara Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 7; Court of Appeal Case Number: B306795; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BA388223

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barbara Smith