This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/31/2022 at 08:36:15 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. THOMAS

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against THOMAS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9577

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Roderick Thomas

Calipatria, CA 92233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Alisha M Carlili

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Maya Perelman

Attorney at Keker & Van Nest & Peters

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Roderick Thomas Attorney: Maya Perelman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: A159153; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: SCN221214

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maya Perelman