This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/13/2022 at 03:10:40 (UTC).

People v. T.F-G.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 People filed an Other lawsuit against T F-G. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bondonno, Franklin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0112

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bondonno, Franklin

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

T. F.

Other

Sixth District Appellate Program

95 S. Market Street, Suite 570

San Jose, CA 95113

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant, Appellant and Other Attorneys

Sixth District Appellate Program

95 S. Market Street, Suite 570

San Jose, CA 95113

Jeffrey Samuel Manning-Cartwright

710 Van Ness Avenue Pmb No. 102

Fresno, CA 93721

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Osc issue on court reporter re: unfiled record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • HearingDescription: Osc issue on court reporter re: unfiled record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Jeffrey Manning-Cartwright

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Court reporter extension granted.; Notes: Osc issue on court reporter re: unfiled record. Due on 07/20/2022 By 20 Day(s) CSR: Pendergraft, Robin Lyn (8951) Extended Due Date: 07/20/2022Per signed acknowledgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: filed 6/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Notice of Appeal filed 5/31/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 21JV45239A; Trial Court Judge: Bondonno, Franklin

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sixth District Appellate Program is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant