This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/07/2022 at 21:25:30 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. TAFICH

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TAFICH. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1203

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Yussef Yirish Tafich

Delano, CA 93216

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

James Henry Flaherty

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

600 West Broadway, Suite 1800 P.O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Marilee Marshall

Attorney at Attorney at Law

20 N. Raymond Avenue, Suite 240

Pasadena, CA 91103

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Granted & Transferred to CA 4/1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: Petition for Review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review granted; transferred to CA 4/1; Notes: The petition for review is granted. The matter is transferred to the Court of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District, Division One, with directions to vacate its decision and reconsider the cause in light of Penal Code section 1170.95, as amended by Senate Bill No. 775 (Stats. 2021, ch. 551). Votes: Cantil-Sakauye, C.J., Corrigan, Liu, Kruger, Groban, and Jenkins, JJ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Yussef Yirish Tafich Attorney: Marilee Marshall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division One; Court of Appeal Case Number: D078265; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Bernardino County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: FWV1102700

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARSHALL, MARILEE