This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/31/2022 at 12:18:56 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. SCOTT

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SCOTT. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9715

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Demisha Scott

Chowchilla, CA 93610

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Attorney General - Los Angeles Office

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 5000

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: letter requesting appointment of counsel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: appellant - Demisha Scott to CCMF - P.O. Box 1508, Chowchila, CA 93610.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record has been imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Demisha Scott Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: B311791; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: TA148089

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant