This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/21/2022 at 21:12:48 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. RUIZ

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RUIZ. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1942

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Frank Ruiz

Chino, CA 91708

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Stephanie Santoro

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Susan S. Bauguess

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 2318

Running Springs, CA 92382

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Granted & Transferred to CA 2/6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: To 2DCA6: One doghouse containing: five petitions for review, one clerk's transcript, one reporter's transcript, and one confidential envelope.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review granted; transferred to CA 2/6; Notes: The petition for review is granted. The matter is transferred to the Court of Appeal, Second Appellate District, Division Six, with directions to vacate its decision and reconsider the cause in light of Assembly Bill No. 518 (Stats. 2021, ch. 441). (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.528(d).) Votes: Cantil-Sakauye, C.J., Corrigan, Liu, Kruger, Groban and Jenkins, JJ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Frank Ruiz Attorney: Susan S. Bauguess

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 6; Court of Appeal Case Number: B307717; Disposition: Affirmed with modifications; Trial Court: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); Trial Court Case Number: 2014011115

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Susan S. Bauguess