This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/18/2022 at 19:00:17 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. ROBINSON

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBINSON. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4005

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Nehemiah Robinson

Blythe, CA 92226

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

A. Natasha Cortina

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Jennifer A. Gambale

111 Pacifica, Suite 120

Irvine, CA 92618

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: one doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Nehemiah Robinson Attorney: Jennifer A. Gambale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Nehemiah Robinson Attorney: Jennifer A. Gambale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Two; Court of Appeal Case Number: E075458; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Bernardino County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BCR2658

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer A. Gambale