This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/08/2022 at 23:00:50 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. RIVERA

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RIVERA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3987

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Gabriel Rivera, Jr.

Wasco, CA 93280

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Cavan M Cox

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

2550 Mariposa Mall, Room 5090

Fresno, CA 93721-3534

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Richard M. Oberto

Attorney at Attorney at Law

516 West Shaw Avenue, Suite 200

Fresno, CA 93704

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Gabriel Rivera, Jr. Attorney: Richard M. Oberto

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fifth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: F081880; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Fresno County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: F18907526

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard M. Oberto