This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/05/2021 at 04:51:57 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. REYES

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against REYES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6962

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Alfredo E. Reyes

Calipatria, CA 92233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Stephanie C. Santoro

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S. Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

James M. Crawford

Attorney at Attorney at Law

528 North Glassell Avenue

Orange, CA 92867

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed; Notes: Upon request of appellant for appointment of counsel, James Crawford is hereby appointed to represent appellant on the appeal now pending in this court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: 2nd record request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review granted; briefing deferred; Notes: The petition for review is granted. Further action in this matter is deferred pending consideration and disposition of related issues in People v. Lewis, S260598 and People v. Strong, S266606 (see Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.512(d)(2)), or pending further order of the court. Submission of additional briefing, pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.520, is deferred pending further order of the court. Votes: Cantil-Sakauye, C.J., Corrigan, Liu, Cullar, Kruger, Groban and Jenkins, JJ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Alfredo E. Reyes Attorney: James M. Crawford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Alfredo E. Reyes Attorney: James M. Crawford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B304108; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BA120197

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie C. Santoro