This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/06/2022 at 11:00:50 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. RANGEL

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RANGEL. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5194

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Myra Rangel

Chowchilla, CA 93610

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Susan Sullivan Pithey

Attorney at ffice of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Charles J. Sarosy

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Brad Kaiserman

Attorney at Attorney at Law

5870 Melrose Avenue, #3396

Los Angeles, CA 90038

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Pub. request(s) denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & publication request(s) denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The request for an order directing publication of the opinion is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed (after initial pub/depublication request); Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Myra Rangel Attorney: Brad Kaiserman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: The People Attorney: Susan Sullivan Pithey Per Court of Appeal order dated 6/13/2022: "... the court does not find said opinion meets the standard for publication as set forth in rule 8.1105 of the California Rules of Court."

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B302169; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: PA070627

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brad Kaiserman