This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/06/2022 at 07:42:46 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. RAMOS

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RAMOS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9679

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Robert Ramirez Ramos

Coalinga, CA 93210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

William K. Kim

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

2550 Mariposa Mall, Room 5090

Fresno, CA 93721

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

John Steinberg

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 8148

Berkeley, CA 94707-8148

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Robert Ramirez Ramos Attorney: John Steinberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Robert Ramirez Ramos Attorney: John Steinberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fifth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: F080918; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Tulare County Superior Court - Main (Visalia); Trial Court Case Number: VCF330241

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Steinberg