This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/07/2022 at 21:22:30 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RAMIREZ. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1215

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Pedro Ramirez

Crescent City, CA 95532

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Arthur Beever

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Cara DeVito

Attorney at Attorney at Law

9360 West Flamingo Road, #110-492

Las Vegas, NV 89147-6446

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review to exhaust state remedies filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Pedro Ramirez Attorney: Cara DeVito

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: A157827; Disposition: Affirmed with modifications; Trial Court: Del Norte County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: CRPB185081

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cara DeVito