This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/28/2021 at 23:35:45 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. PALMER

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PALMER. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1254

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Kelsie J. Palmer

Represa, CA 95671

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Michael C. Keller

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Waldemar D. Halka

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 99965

San Diego, CA 92169-1965

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Supplemental Petition for Review Kelsie J. Palmer, Defendant and Appellant Waldemar D. Halka, CA appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed; Notes: Appellant's motion for leave to supplement the petition for review filed on November 9, 2021, is hereby granted. Appellant may file the supplemental petition for review on or before November 18, 2021. Respondent will then have until November 22, 2021 to serve and file an answer to the petition for review and supplemental petition for review. No reply to the answer to petition for review is contemplated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed; Notes: "Motion for Leave of Court to Supplement Petition for Review with Assembly Bill No. 333" Kelsie J. Palmer, Defendant and Appellant Waldemar D. Halka, CA appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: 1 doghouse.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Kelsie J. Palmer Attorney: Waldemar D. Halka

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: B302342; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BA356413

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Waldemar D. Halka