This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/22/2022 at 15:00:19 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ORTIZ. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6095

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Walmir Ortiz

Ione, CA 95640

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Taylor Oetting

Attorney at Ofc Attorney General

600 West Broadway, Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Brad Kannof Kaiserman

5870 Melrose Avenue, Suite 3396

Los Angeles, CA 90038-3760

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Walmir Ortiz Attorney: Brad Kannof Kaiserman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Sixth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: H048258; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Santa Clara County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: C1767736

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brad Kaiserman