This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/11/2021 at 06:29:00 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ORTIZ. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7452

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Manuel Ortiz, Jr.

Represa, CA 95671

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Stacy S. Schwartz

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Stephen M. Hinkle

Attorney at Attorney at Law

290 Martellago Drive

North Venice, FL 34275

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied without prejudice to any relief to which defendant might be entitled after this court decides People v. Kopp, S257844.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Manuel Ortiz, Jr. Attorney: Stephen M. Hinkle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Manuel Ortiz, Jr. Attorney: Stephen M. Hinkle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: B302347; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BA467237

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacy S. Schwartz