This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/12/2021 at 21:08:19 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. OMEGA

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against OMEGA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1250

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Nalana Nicole Omega

Chowchilla, CA 93610

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

A. Kay Lauterbach

Attorney at Office of State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Kevin D. Sheehy

Attorney at Attorney at Law

2118 Wilshire Boulevard, #1118

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: one doghouse ( volume 1 of 3 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Nalana Nicole Omega Attorney: Kevin D. Sheehy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Nalana Nicole Omega Attorney: Kevin D. Sheehy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C085437; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: El Dorado County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: P15CRF0067

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Dennis Sheehy