This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/31/2022 at 12:21:44 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. OLIVAS

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against OLIVAS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9717

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Adrien Olivas

Salinas, CA 93906

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Julia Y. Je

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Maggie Shrout

Attorney at Attorney at Law

345 California Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: Corrigan, J., was absent and did not participate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Adrien Olivas Attorney: Maggie Shrout

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Sixth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: H047834; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Monterey County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 17CR000690

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maggie Shrout