This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/09/2022 at 14:23:01 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. NIETO

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against NIETO. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9350

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

John Nieto

Susanville, CA 96127

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Seth Matthew Friedman

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Jennifer A. Gambale

Attorney at Attorney at Law

111 Pacifica, Suite 120

Irvine, CA 92618

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: John Nieto Attorney: Jennifer A. Gambale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: John Nieto Attorney: Jennifer A. Gambale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Two; Court of Appeal Case Number: E074435; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Bernardino County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: FWV17004499

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer A. Gambale