This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 12/11/2021 at 02:22:02 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. NIETO

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against NIETO. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8294

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Eddie Nieto

Coalinga, CA 93210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Catherine Chatman

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1300 I Street P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Cara DeVito

Attorney at Attorney at Law

9360 West Flamingo Road, No. 110-492

Las Vegas, NV 89147

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record has been imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review to exhaust state remedies filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Eddie Nieto Attorney: Cara DeVito

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Eddie Nieto Attorney: Cara DeVito

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fifth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: F078693; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Kern County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: BF168714A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Catherine Baker Chatman