This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/03/2022 at 06:04:09 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. NGUYEN

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against NGUYEN. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5783

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Sutter Nguyen

Soledad, CA 93960

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Matthew A. Kearney

Attorney at Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Robert J. Beles

Attorney at Attorney at Law

One Kaiser Plaza, Suite 2300

Oakland, CA 94612-3642

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: one doghouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Sutter Nguyen Attorney: Robert J. Beles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C093222; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Sacramento County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 02F11038

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELES, ROBERT J.