This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/23/2022 at 05:06:26 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. MUNOZ

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MUNOZ. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5656

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Rene Pascual Munoz

Corcoran, CA 93212

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan M. Smith

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1230

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Kevin D. Sheehy

Attorney at Attorney at Law

2118 Wilshire Boulevard, #1118

Santa Monica, CA 90403-5784

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: one doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Rene Pascual Munoz Attorney: Kevin D. Sheehy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Rene Pascual Munoz Attorney: Kevin D. Sheehy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B312133; Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: PA003232

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Dennis Sheehy