This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/31/2022 at 08:36:56 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. MORALES

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MORALES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9574

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Eladio Cortez Morales

Avenal, CA 93204

Not Yet Classified

Sixth District Appellate Program

95 S. Market Street, Suite 570

San Jose, CA 95113

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Julia Y. Je

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Carrie Kojimoto

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 15802

San Francisco, CA 94115

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied without prejudice to any relief to which defendant might be entitled after this court decides People v. Arnold, S269172. Corrigan, J., was absent and did not participate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Eladio Cortez Morales Attorney: Carrie Kojimoto

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Sixth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: H047313; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Santa Clara County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: FF513517

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sixth District Appellate Program is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carrie Setsu Kojimoto