This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/23/2022 at 00:09:00 (UTC).

People v. Martin

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 People filed an Other lawsuit against Martin. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Peterson, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9467

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Peterson, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Eric Patrick Martin

Vacaville, CA 95696-2000

Not Yet Classified

Sixth District Appellate Program

95 S. Market Street, Suite 570

San Jose, CA 95113

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Victoria Ratnikova

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Appellant, Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

David W. Beaudreau

748 S. Meadows Parkway Suite A9-182

Reno, NV 89521

Sixth District Appellate Program

95 S. Market Street, Suite 570

San Jose, CA 95113

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Eric Patrick Martin Attorney: David W. Beaudreau

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Eric Patrick MartinAttorney: David W. Beaudreau

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: The People Attorney: Victoria Ratnikova * Partial concession *

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: The PeopleAttorney: Victoria Ratnikova; Notes: * Partial concession *

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: 3rd * No further extensions *

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: 3rd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: 2nd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: 1st

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Eric Patrick Martin Attorney: David W. Beaudreau

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Eric Patrick MartinAttorney: David W. Beaudreau

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: 1st

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: Record filed, AOB due in 40 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: CT-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: David Beaudreau appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: NOA filed 10/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 92934; Trial Court Judge: Peterson, Elizabeth

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sixth District Appellate Program is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant